LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB610
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB610
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB610
Compare Versions
SB610 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB610 Amended June 30, 2014
SB610 Amended June 10, 2014
SB610 Amended June 24, 2013
SB610 Amended May 9, 2013
SB610 Amended April 8, 2013
SB610 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB610 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB610 Amended June 30, 2014
SB610 Amended June 10, 2014
SB610 Amended June 24, 2013
SB610 Amended May 9, 2013
SB610 Amended April 8, 2013
SB610 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare