Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2956.) Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1185.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 788.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 770.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 750.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|