California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill January 7, 2014
Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013