California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2013

Amended

Bill June 12, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013