LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB612
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB612
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB612
Compare Versions
SB612 Chaptered August 19, 2013
SB612 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB612 Amended June 12, 2013
SB612 Amended April 23, 2013
SB612 Amended April 8, 2013
SB612 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB612 Chaptered August 19, 2013
SB612 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB612 Amended June 12, 2013
SB612 Amended April 23, 2013
SB612 Amended April 8, 2013
SB612 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare