|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2281.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3011.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1096.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|