California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013