Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5910.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby Assembly amendments were concurred in. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered held at the Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1852.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 2481.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 970.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 853.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 566.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|