LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB628
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB628
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB628
Compare Versions
SB628 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB628 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB628 Amended August 26, 2014
SB628 Amended August 7, 2014
SB628 Amended August 5, 2013
SB628 Amended June 17, 2013
SB628 Amended May 14, 2013
SB628 Amended April 10, 2013
SB628 Amended April 2, 2013
SB628 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB628 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB628 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB628 Amended August 26, 2014
SB628 Amended August 7, 2014
SB628 Amended August 5, 2013
SB628 Amended June 17, 2013
SB628 Amended May 14, 2013
SB628 Amended April 10, 2013
SB628 Amended April 2, 2013
SB628 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare