Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2014 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2014 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1664.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2013 | Set for hearing July 2. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing June 4. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |