California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill June 10, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013