|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2297.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 2998.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2868.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1107.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1018.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 754.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 664.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|