California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB666 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013