Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 12. Noes 44. Page 3148.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Dickinson.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2940.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 719.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 564.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|