LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB670
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB670
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB670
Compare Versions
SB670 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB670 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB670 Amended September 11, 2013
SB670 Amended September 6, 2013
SB670 Amended August 19, 2013
SB670 Amended August 6, 2013
SB670 Amended May 24, 2013
SB670 Amended April 8, 2013
SB670 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB670 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB670 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB670 Amended September 11, 2013
SB670 Amended September 6, 2013
SB670 Amended August 19, 2013
SB670 Amended August 6, 2013
SB670 Amended May 24, 2013
SB670 Amended April 8, 2013
SB670 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare