|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5906.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 1188.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|