LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB673
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB673
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB673
Compare Versions
SB673 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB673 Enrolled August 8, 2014
SB673 Amended January 23, 2014
SB673 Amended January 6, 2014
SB673 Amended May 21, 2013
SB673 Amended April 15, 2013
SB673 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB673 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB673 Enrolled August 8, 2014
SB673 Amended January 23, 2014
SB673 Amended January 6, 2014
SB673 Amended May 21, 2013
SB673 Amended April 15, 2013
SB673 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare