|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 471, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2042.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 810.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 564.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|