California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill June 12, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013