|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2387.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|