LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB680
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB680
Compare Versions
SB680 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB680 Enrolled August 13, 2013
SB680 Amended May 14, 2013
SB680 Amended April 1, 2013
SB680 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB680 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB680 Enrolled August 13, 2013
SB680 Amended May 14, 2013
SB680 Amended April 1, 2013
SB680 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare