Assembly | 06/11/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1116.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 696.) (May 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |