LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB714
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB714
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB714
Compare Versions
SB714 Amended May 20, 2014
SB714 Amended May 24, 2013
SB714 Amended May 7, 2013
SB714 Amended April 15, 2013
SB714 Amended April 1, 2013
SB714 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB714 Amended May 20, 2014
SB714 Amended May 24, 2013
SB714 Amended May 7, 2013
SB714 Amended April 15, 2013
SB714 Amended April 1, 2013
SB714 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare