Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5914.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5915.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 974.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 664.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 618.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|