LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB718
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB718
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB718
Compare Versions
SB718 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB718 Enrolled August 13, 2014
SB718 Amended August 7, 2014
SB718 Amended September 3, 2013
SB718 Amended June 20, 2013
SB718 Amended May 15, 2013
SB718 Amended April 4, 2013
SB718 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB718 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB718 Enrolled August 13, 2014
SB718 Amended August 7, 2014
SB718 Amended September 3, 2013
SB718 Amended June 20, 2013
SB718 Amended May 15, 2013
SB718 Amended April 4, 2013
SB718 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare