|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2879.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 487.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|