BILL NUMBER: SB 723ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 20, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 4, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Correa (Coauthors: Senators Leno and Lieu) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 325.51 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 723, Correa. Veterans. Existing law requires the Employment Development Department, in consultation and coordination with veterans' organizations and veteran service providers, to research the needs of veterans throughout the state and develop a profile of veterans' employment and training needs and to seek federal funding for those purposes. This bill would require the Employment Development Department and the Department of Consumer Affairs, on or before January 1, 2015, jointly to present a report to the Legislature containing best practices by state governments around the nation in facilitating the credentialing of veterans by using their documented military education and experience. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 325.51 is added to the Unemployment Insurance Code, immediately following Section 325.5, to read: 325.51. The Employment Development Department and the Department of Consumer Affairs, on or before January 1, 2015, jointly shall present a report to the Legislature containing best practices by state governments around the nation in facilitating the credentialing of veterans by using their documented military education and experience.