|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2139.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2836.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 488.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|