LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB725
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB725
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB725
Compare Versions
SB725 Chaptered October 10, 2013
SB725 Enrolled September 6, 2013
SB725 Amended August 8, 2013
SB725 Amended June 26, 2013
SB725 Amended May 14, 2013
SB725 Amended May 1, 2013
SB725 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB725 Chaptered October 10, 2013
SB725 Enrolled September 6, 2013
SB725 Amended August 8, 2013
SB725 Amended June 26, 2013
SB725 Amended May 14, 2013
SB725 Amended May 1, 2013
SB725 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare