Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3032.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2942.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1162.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 790.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|