LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB726
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB726
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB726
Compare Versions
SB726 Chaptered September 28, 2013
SB726 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB726 Amended September 11, 2013
SB726 Amended September 9, 2013
SB726 Amended September 6, 2013
SB726 Amended August 22, 2013
SB726 Amended August 5, 2013
SB726 Amended June 24, 2013
SB726 Amended May 24, 2013
SB726 Amended April 8, 2013
SB726 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB726 Chaptered September 28, 2013
SB726 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB726 Amended September 11, 2013
SB726 Amended September 9, 2013
SB726 Amended September 6, 2013
SB726 Amended August 22, 2013
SB726 Amended August 5, 2013
SB726 Amended June 24, 2013
SB726 Amended May 24, 2013
SB726 Amended April 8, 2013
SB726 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare