|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2300.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 33. Page 3022.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2879.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 937.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 697.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|