LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB746
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB746
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB746
Compare Versions
SB746 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB746 Amended September 4, 2013
SB746 Amended August 6, 2013
SB746 Amended June 25, 2013
SB746 Amended June 17, 2013
SB746 Amended April 30, 2013
SB746 Amended April 16, 2013
SB746 Amended April 9, 2013
SB746 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB746 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB746 Amended September 4, 2013
SB746 Amended August 6, 2013
SB746 Amended June 25, 2013
SB746 Amended June 17, 2013
SB746 Amended April 30, 2013
SB746 Amended April 16, 2013
SB746 Amended April 9, 2013
SB746 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare