LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB749
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB749
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB749
Compare Versions
SB749 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB749 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB749 Amended September 6, 2013
SB749 Amended August 12, 2013
SB749 Amended July 3, 2013
SB749 Amended June 25, 2013
SB749 Amended April 16, 2013
SB749 Amended April 1, 2013
SB749 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB749 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB749 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB749 Amended September 6, 2013
SB749 Amended August 12, 2013
SB749 Amended July 3, 2013
SB749 Amended June 25, 2013
SB749 Amended April 16, 2013
SB749 Amended April 1, 2013
SB749 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare