California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013