|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 698, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|