LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB759
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB759
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB759
Compare Versions
SB759 Chaptered October 10, 2013
SB759 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB759 Amended April 25, 2013
SB759 Amended April 3, 2013
SB759 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB759 Chaptered October 10, 2013
SB759 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB759 Amended April 25, 2013
SB759 Amended April 3, 2013
SB759 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare