|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 931, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4907.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 6486.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2653.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wolk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 990.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 752.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|