LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB785
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB785
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB785
Compare Versions
SB785 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB785 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB785 Amended August 22, 2014
SB785 Amended August 13, 2014
SB785 Amended August 4, 2014
SB785 Amended June 17, 2014
SB785 Amended January 14, 2014
SB785 Amended May 2, 2013
SB785 Amended April 23, 2013
SB785 Amended April 1, 2013
SB785 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB785 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB785 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB785 Amended August 22, 2014
SB785 Amended August 13, 2014
SB785 Amended August 4, 2014
SB785 Amended June 17, 2014
SB785 Amended January 14, 2014
SB785 Amended May 2, 2013
SB785 Amended April 23, 2013
SB785 Amended April 1, 2013
SB785 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare