|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 473, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2043.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2714.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2670.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1118.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|