California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013