|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 919, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6416.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3656.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3703.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|