California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 5, 2014