Senate | 06/10/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3703.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2831.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing February 26. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2777.) (February 19). | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | Set for hearing February 19. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2745.) (February 11). | ||
Senate | 01/24/2014 | Set for hearing February 11. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., E.Q., and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |