LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB848
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB848
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB848
Compare Versions
SB848 Amended July 3, 2014
SB848 Amended June 23, 2014
SB848 Amended June 10, 2014
SB848 Amended February 20, 2014
SB848 Amended February 12, 2014
SB848 Introduced January 9, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB848 Amended July 3, 2014
SB848 Amended June 23, 2014
SB848 Amended June 10, 2014
SB848 Amended February 20, 2014
SB848 Amended February 12, 2014
SB848 Introduced January 9, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare