Senate | 06/02/2014 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 3699.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3699.) Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 15. Page 3668.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hill. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3668.) | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3704.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3235.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |