California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2014

Amended

Bill May 29, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014