Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3704.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3235.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3119.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|