LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB894
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB894
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB894
Compare Versions
SB894 Amended June 26, 2014
SB894 Amended June 19, 2014
SB894 Amended May 27, 2014
SB894 Amended May 7, 2014
SB894 Amended April 29, 2014
SB894 Amended April 9, 2014
SB894 Amended March 26, 2014
SB894 Amended February 14, 2014
SB894 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB894 Amended June 26, 2014
SB894 Amended June 19, 2014
SB894 Amended May 27, 2014
SB894 Amended May 7, 2014
SB894 Amended April 29, 2014
SB894 Amended April 9, 2014
SB894 Amended March 26, 2014
SB894 Amended February 14, 2014
SB894 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare