|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 6554.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6344.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3650.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3704.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3120.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|